NC H722 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Expand Allowable Growler Size
Title
Expand Allowable Growler Size
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-07 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/06/2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-29 | House | Ref to the Com on Alcoholic Beverage Control, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Abc Comn.
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Alcoholic Beverages
Beer & Wine
Commerce
Commissions
Public
Retailing
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Alcoholic Beverages
Beer & Wine
Commerce
Commissions
Public
Retailing
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
150B | 19 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
150B | 21.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text |