NC H717 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Abolish Office of County Coroner

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abolish Office of County Coroner

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-10SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-10SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-05-07HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-06HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-06HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-05HousePlaced On Cal For 05/06/2021
2021-05-05HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-05HouseReptd Fav
2021-05-05HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-05HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-04-29HouseRef to the Com on State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-29HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-28HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1(n/a)Citation Text
1313(n/a)Citation Text
128(n/a)Citation Text
12813(n/a)Citation Text
130A(n/a)Citation Text
130A389.1(n/a)Citation Text
130A394(n/a)Citation Text
130A420(n/a)Citation Text
14(n/a)Citation Text
14230(n/a)Citation Text
14240(n/a)Citation Text
153A(n/a)Citation Text
153A149(n/a)Citation Text
153A225(n/a)Citation Text
162(n/a)Citation Text
16213(n/a)Citation Text
16216(n/a)Citation Text
1625(n/a)Citation Text
1625.1(n/a)Citation Text
163(n/a)Citation Text
1631(n/a)Citation Text
17(n/a)Citation Text
1718(n/a)Citation Text
1719(n/a)Citation Text
1722(n/a)Citation Text
1744(n/a)Citation Text
1A(n/a)Citation Text
1A1(n/a)Citation Text
39(n/a)Citation Text
395(n/a)Citation Text
58(n/a)Citation Text
5872-10(n/a)Citation Text
5876-15(n/a)Citation Text
5876-25(n/a)Citation Text
5876-30(n/a)Citation Text
5876-5(n/a)Citation Text
7A(n/a)Citation Text
7A312(n/a)Citation Text
90(n/a)Citation Text
90210.124(n/a)Citation Text
90210.25(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback