NC H71 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-9)
Status: Engrossed on July 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-19 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Living Donor Protection Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Living Donor Protection Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-19SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-07-19SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-07-19SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-07-15HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-07-14HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-07-14HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-07-14HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-07-14HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-07-14HouseReptd Fav
2021-06-30HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-06-30HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 3
2021-06-03HouseRe-ref Com On Insurance
2021-06-03HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2021-03-03HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added
2021-03-03HouseSerial Referral To Insurance Added
2021-03-03HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2021-03-02HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2021-03-02HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-02-15HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-02-15HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H71
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H71v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H71v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H71v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H71v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H71v4.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/855/0/H71-PCS10082-SHf-3
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51988/0/H71-PCS10502-SVf-18
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52410/0/H71-PCS30451-SVf-26
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H71-SMSH-2(e1)-v-7
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H71-SMSV-60(CSSVf-18)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H71-SMSV-71(CSSVf-26)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H71-SMSV-73(e4)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/437

Bill Comments

feedback