NC H707 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-2)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-21 - Re-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-21 - Re-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Student Borrowers' Bill of Rights
Title
Student Borrowers' Bill of Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-21 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-07-21 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2021-07-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2021-06-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Banking |
2021-06-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-29 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - Universities, if favorable, Banking, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Banking Comn.
Banks
Commerce
Commissioner Of Banks
Confidentiality
Consumer Protection
Cybersecurity
Debtor & Creditor
Education
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Services
Higher Education
Information Technology
Licenses & Permits
Loans
Privacy
Public
Students
Tuition
Banks
Commerce
Commissioner Of Banks
Confidentiality
Consumer Protection
Cybersecurity
Debtor & Creditor
Education
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Services
Higher Education
Information Technology
Licenses & Permits
Loans
Privacy
Public
Students
Tuition
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
53 | 440 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 441 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 442 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 443 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 444 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 445 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 446 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 447 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 448 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 449 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 450 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 451 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 452 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 453 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 454 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 455 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 456 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 457 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 458 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 459 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 460 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 461 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53 | 462 | (n/a) | Citation Text |