NC H705 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Ch. SL 2015-147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Ch. SL 2015-147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Septic Tank Requirements
Title
Amend Septic Tank Requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Brody [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-02 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-13 | Ch. SL 2015-147 | |
2015-07-13 | Signed by Gov. 7/13/2015 | |
2015-07-06 | Pres. To Gov. 7/6/2015 | |
2015-07-02 | Ratified | |
2015-07-02 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-07-02 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2015-07-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/02/2015 |
2015-06-30 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2015-06-29 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-06-25 | Engrossed | |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-28 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-15 | House | Ref To Com On Regulatory Reform |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Filed |