NC H704 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-27 - Ref To Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-27 - Ref To Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Rural Health Care Stabilization Act
Title
Rural Health Care Stabilization Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Lewis [R] | Rep. Gregory Murphy [R] | Rep. Joshua Dobson [R] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Shelly Willingham [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-27 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2019-08-27 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-05-03 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/02/2019 |
2019-05-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-11 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S252 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Ch. SL 2019-26