NC H703 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Breast Cancer Diagnostic Imaging Parity
Title
Breast Cancer Diagnostic Imaging Parity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2021-05-12 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/12/2021 |
2021-05-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Cancer
Diseases & Health Disorders
Health
Health Education
Health Services
Insurance
Public
Public Health
Testing
Women
Diseases & Health Disorders
Health
Health Education
Health Services
Insurance
Public
Public Health
Testing
Women
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
58 | 3-271 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 51-57 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 65-92 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 67-76 | (n/a) | Citation Text |