NC H7 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 30-3)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Protect City Employees From Retaliation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protect City Employees From Retaliation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-12HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2021-05-11HousePlaced On Cal For 05/12/2021
2021-05-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-11HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 3
2021-05-10HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-10HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2021-04-22HouseRe-ref to the Com on Judiciary 3, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-22HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-02-23HouseRe-ref Com On Judiciary 1
2021-02-23HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-01-28HouseRef to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-01-28HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-01-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
160A164(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H7
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H7v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H7v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H7v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H7v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H7v4.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/611/0/H7-PCS40111-BD-1
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51505/0/H7-PCS40582-BB-7
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51713/0/H7-PCS30424-BB-9
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H7-SMBD-1(CSBD-1)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H7-SMBD-4(CSBV-2)-v-8
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H7-SMBB-26(CSBB-7)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H7-SMBB-37(e3)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H7-SMBB-41(e4)-v-2

Bill Comments

feedback