NC H697 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State Surplus Prop. Computers for Nonprofits
Title
State Surplus Prop. Computers for Nonprofits
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Horn [R] | Rep. Jason Saine [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Elmore [R] | Rep. Jean Farmer-Butterfield [D] |
Rep. Kyle Hall [R] | Rep. Brenden Jones [R] | Rep. Raymond Smith [D] | Rep. Shelly Willingham [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/29/2019 |
2019-04-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-11 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Filed |