NC H696 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-16 - Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-16 - Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Various Changes to Nonprofit Corporations Act
Title
Various Changes to Nonprofit Corporations Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added |
2021-06-16 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Added |
2021-06-16 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2021-06-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary 1 |
2021-06-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-28 | House | Ref to the Com on State Government, if favorable, Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S540 (Same As) 2021-04-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Commerce
Corporations
Council Of State
Incorporation
Nonprofit
Notification
Property
Public
Public Officials
Sales & Conveyances
Secretary Of State
Corporations
Council Of State
Incorporation
Nonprofit
Notification
Property
Public
Public Officials
Sales & Conveyances
Secretary Of State
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55A | 1-22 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 1-50 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 1-60 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 1-70 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 11-02 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 11-09 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 11B-01 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 11B-04 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 11B-05 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 11B-06 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 11B-07 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 11B-08 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 11B-09 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 12-02 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 14-20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 14-22 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 16-22.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 7-04 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 8-03 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 8-11 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 8-21 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 8-25 | (n/a) | Citation Text |