NC H695 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Modify Charitable Solicitation Licensing Laws
Title
Modify Charitable Solicitation Licensing Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2021-05-13 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-12 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-12 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-12 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-11 | House | Serial Referral To Judiciary 1 Stricken |
2021-04-28 | House | Ref to the Com on State Government, if favorable, Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S681 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Charitable Donations
Corporations
Council Of State
Licenses & Permits
Ngos
Nonprofit
Public
Public Officials
Secretary Of State
Corporations
Council Of State
Licenses & Permits
Ngos
Nonprofit
Public
Public Officials
Secretary Of State
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
131F | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
131F | 15 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
131F | 16 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
131F | 3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
131F | 5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
131F | 6 | (n/a) | Citation Text |