NC H689 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
2021 House Permanent Rules
Title
2021 House Permanent Rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - R2 For Adoption (Y: 83 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-06 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2021-05-06 | House | Com Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/06/2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav As Amended |
2021-05-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-03 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/05/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/28/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant 32 |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Filed |