NC H686 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Failed To Override Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Freedom to Celebrate the Fourth of July

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Freedom to Celebrate the Fourth of July

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-08 - House - Veto Override (Y: 58 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 67 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 27 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08HouseFailed To Override Veto
2020-07-02HousePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2020
2020-07-02HouseCal Pursuant Rule 44.2
2020-07-02HouseReceived from the Governor
2020-07-02 Vetoed 07/02/2020
2020-06-24 Pres. To Gov. 6/24/2020
2020-06-24 Ratified
2020-06-23HouseOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-23HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2020-06-22HousePlaced On Cal For 06/23/2020
2020-06-22HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2020-06-22HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2020-06-22SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2020-06-19SenateEngrossed
2020-06-19SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-19SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-19SenateAmend Adopted A2
2020-06-19SenateAmendment Withdrawn A1
2020-06-19SenateAmend Recon A1
2020-06-19SenateReconsidered 2nd Reading
2020-06-19SenateEngrossed
2020-06-19SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-19SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-19SenateAmend Adopted A1
2020-06-19SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-06-19SenateReptd Fav
2020-06-18SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-18SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2020-06-18SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-17SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-17SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-07SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-07SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-07SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-05-07HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-07HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-07HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-06HousePlaced On Cal For 05/07/2019
2019-05-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-06HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-03HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-03HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-11HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-11HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-10HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H686
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H686v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H686v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H686v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H686v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H686v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H686v5.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/431
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/793
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/792
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/788
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/787
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1007
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1089

Bill Comments

feedback