NC H684 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
LRC Study Development Exactions
Title
LRC Study Development Exactions
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Moffitt [R] | Rep. Mark Brody [R] | Rep. Matthew Winslow [R] | Rep. Jeff Zenger [R] |
Rep. Hugh Blackwell [R] | Rep. Francis Iler [R] | Rep. Keith Kidwell [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 95 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-07 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/06/2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-27 | House | Ref to the Com on State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Commissions
Construction
Construction Industry
General Assembly
Housing
Legislative Research Comn.
Local Government
Planning & Zoning
Property
Public
Reports
Studies
Construction
Construction Industry
General Assembly
Housing
Legislative Research Comn.
Local Government
Planning & Zoning
Property
Public
Reports
Studies