NC H684 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Ch. SL 2013-137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Ch. SL 2013-137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Increase Driveway Safety on Curvy Roads
Title
Increase Driveway Safety on Curvy Roads
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Ch. SL 2013-137 | |
2013-06-19 | Signed by Gov. 6/19/2013 | |
2013-06-13 | Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2013 | |
2013-06-13 | Ratified | |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/12/2013 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/11/2013 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-13 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/14/2013 |
2013-05-13 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-13 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-11 | House | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-09 | House | Filed |