NC H68 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-9)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-21 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

BRIGHT Futures Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BRIGHT Futures Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-21SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-21SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-21SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-04-21HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-04-20HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-04-20HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-04-19HousePlaced On Cal For 04/20/2017
2017-04-19HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-04-19HouseSerial Referral To Commerce and Job Development Stricken
2017-04-19HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-02-09HouseRef to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Commerce and Job Development
2017-02-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S65 (Same As) 2017-02-13 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback