NC H68 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Ch. SL 2013-111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establish Ombudsman/Foster Care/Gaston County

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish Ombudsman/Foster Care/Gaston County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-13 Ch. SL 2013-111
2013-06-13 Ratified
2013-06-12SenateOrdered Enrolled
2013-06-12SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-06-12SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-06-11SenateReptd Fav
2013-04-03SenateRef To Com On State and Local Government
2013-04-03SenatePassed 1st Reading
2013-04-03SenateRec From House
2013-04-02HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-04-02HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-03-28HousePlaced On Cal For 04/02/2013
2013-03-28HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2013-03-28HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2013-02-06HouseRef To Com On Government
2013-02-06HousePassed 1st Reading
2013-02-05HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback