NC H68 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Ch. SL 2011-45
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Tax Certification - Add Counties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Certification - Add Counties

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-20 Ch. SL 2011-45
2011-04-20 Ratified
2011-04-19 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2011-04-18 Placed On Cal For 4/19/2011
2011-04-18 Withdrawn From Cal
2011-04-16 Placed On Cal For 4/18/2011
2011-04-16 Withdrawn From Cal
2011-04-14 Reptd Fav
2011-03-14 Ref To Com On State and Local Government
2011-03-14 Passed 1st Reading
2011-03-11 Rec From House
2011-03-10 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2011-03-09 Placed On Cal For 3/10/2011
2011-03-09 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2011-03-09 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2011-02-21 Re-ref Com On Finance
2011-02-21 Reptd Fav
2011-02-10 Ref To Com On Government
2011-02-10 Passed 1st Reading
2011-02-09 Filed

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback