NC H676 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-14 - Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Commerce and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-14 - Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Commerce and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
New Architect Recruitment Act
Title
New Architect Recruitment Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/11/2021 |
2021-05-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary 1 |
2021-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-27 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government - Land Use, Planning and Development, if favorable, Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Architects & Architecture
Architecture Board
Boards
Education
Licensing & Certification
Occupations
Professional Education
Public
Architecture Board
Boards
Education
Licensing & Certification
Occupations
Professional Education
Public
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
83A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
83A | 3 | (n/a) | Citation Text |