NC H67 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-22 - Ch. SL 2021-88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

GSC Technical Corrections 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GSC Technical Corrections 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-13 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-22 Ch. SL 2021-88
2021-07-22 Signed by Gov. 7/22/2021
2021-07-15 Pres. To Gov. 7/15/2021
2021-07-14 Ratified
2021-07-13HouseOrdered Enrolled
2021-07-13HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2021-07-06HousePlaced On Cal For 07/13/2021
2021-07-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-07-06HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-07-06HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-07-06HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2021-07-02HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2021-07-02HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2021-07-01SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-06-30SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-06-30SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-06-29SenateReptd Fav
2021-06-24SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-24SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-06-24SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-06-15SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-15SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-03SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-03SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-03SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2021-03-03HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2021-03-03HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-03-03HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-03-03HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-03-03HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-03-03HouseReptd Fav
2021-02-23HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-02-23HouseReptd Fav
2021-02-11HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-02-11HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-10HouseFiled

Subjects

Abc Comn.
Admin. Hearings Office
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Alcoholic Beverages
Aoc
Armed Forces
Attorneys
Banking Comn.
Banks
Beer & Wine
Building Codes
Buildings
Chaptered
Child Custody
Child Support
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
Commerce
Commissioner Of Banks
Commissions
Continuing Care Facilities
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Records
Death & Dying
Debtor & Creditor
Developmental Disabilities
Dhhs
District Attorneys
Divorce
Electronic Government
Employment
Estates
Family Issues
Financial Institutions
Flags
Fraud
General Statutes
Group Homes
Guardianship
Health
Health Services
Hospitals
Housing
Id Systems
Information Technology
Inspections
Institutionalized Persons
Insurance
Internet
Judicial Dept.
Landlord & Tenant
Licenses & Permits
Licensing & Certification
Local Government
Local Ordinances
Medicaid
Medical Care Comn.
Mental Health
Military Affairs Dept.
Minors
Occupations
Planning & Zoning
Poverty
Presented
Property
Public
Public Health
Ratified
Real Estate
Records
Rentals & Leasing
Retailing
Session Laws
Social Services
Substance Abuse
Taxation
Taxes
Theft
Title Change
Veterans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1120.2(n/a)Citation Text
108A58.2(n/a)Citation Text
108A61.1(n/a)Citation Text
108A70.5(n/a)Citation Text
113276(n/a)Citation Text
115C218.75(n/a)Citation Text
122C(n/a)Citation Text
122C151.4(n/a)Citation Text
122C23(n/a)Citation Text
131E267(n/a)Citation Text
131E272(n/a)Citation Text
14113.9(n/a)Citation Text
143318.18(n/a)Citation Text
143A96.1(n/a)Citation Text
143B1413(n/a)Citation Text
1449(n/a)Citation Text
150B(n/a)Citation Text
150B2(n/a)Citation Text
150B21.2(n/a)Citation Text
150B23(n/a)Citation Text
150B38(n/a)Citation Text
15A151.5(n/a)Citation Text
160D1102(n/a)Citation Text
160D1111(n/a)Citation Text
160D1202(n/a)Citation Text
160D403(n/a)Citation Text
160D604(n/a)Citation Text
160D605(n/a)Citation Text
160D907(n/a)Citation Text
160D944(n/a)Citation Text
18B302(n/a)Citation Text
18B900(n/a)Citation Text
28A14-1(n/a)Citation Text
36C8-818(n/a)Citation Text
42(n/a)Citation Text
4234.1(n/a)Citation Text
5013.7(n/a)Citation Text
85B3.2(n/a)Citation Text
90B9.1(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H67
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H67v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H67v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H67v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H67v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H67v4.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52325/0/H67-PCS40643-MU-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/ExplanatoryMemo/2021/H67-EMMU-5(e1)-v-6
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/ExplanatoryMemo/2021/H67-EMMU-6(e1)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/ExplanatoryMemo/2021/H67-EMMU-21(CSMU-1)-v-12
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/ExplanatoryMemo/2021/H67-EMMU-23(e2)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/11
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/335
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/434

Bill Comments 750

feedback