NC H665 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Address Direct Sup. Staffing Crisis/Medicaid

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Address Direct Sup. Staffing Crisis/Medicaid

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations
2021-06-08HouseReptd Fav
2021-04-27HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-27HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S610 (Same As) 2021-04-07 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate

Subjects


North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback