NC H664 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Ch. SL 2013-185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Ch. SL 2013-185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cell Tower Deployment Act
Title
Cell Tower Deployment Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-17 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Ch. SL 2013-185 | |
2013-06-26 | Signed by Gov. 6/26/2013 | |
2013-06-18 | Pres. To Gov. 6/18/2013 | |
2013-06-18 | Ratified | |
2013-06-17 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-17 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2013-06-13 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/17/2013 |
2013-06-13 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2013-06-12 | House | Rec To Concur S Com Sub |
2013-06-12 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-06-11 | Engrossed | |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/11/2013 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Ref to Commerce. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-13 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-13 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/13/2013 |
2013-05-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-09 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-05-08 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-10 | House | Ref to the Com on Public Utilities and Energy, if favorable, Finance |
2013-04-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-09 | House | Filed |