NC H664 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-51
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-51
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Avery: Deed Recordation & Delinquent Taxes
Title
Avery: Deed Recordation & Delinquent Taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Ch. SL 2010-51 | |
2010-07-01 | Ratified | |
2010-07-01 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-06 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-04-06 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-02 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Placed On Cal For 4/2/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-19 | Ref To Com On Local Government I | |
2009-03-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-18 | Filed |