NC H659 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Ch. SL 2018-102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Filling Vacancies/U.S. Senate

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Filling Vacancies/U.S. Senate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 71 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 74 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - A1 Floyd Second Reading (Y: 51 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26 Ch. SL 2018-102
2018-06-26HouseBecame Law W/o Signature
2018-06-15 Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018
2018-06-14 Ratified
2018-06-13HouseOrdered Enrolled
2018-06-13HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2018-06-13HouseAdded to Calendar
2018-06-12HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2018-06-12HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2018-06-12SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2018-06-12SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2018-06-12SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2018-06-12SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-06-12SenateReptd Fav
2018-06-12SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-12SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2018-06-12SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2018-06-11SenateRe-ref to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-11SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-04-27SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-27SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-27SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-04-27HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-04-26HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-04-26HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-04-26HouseAmend Failed A1
2017-04-26HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-04-26HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-04-26HouseReptd Fav
2017-04-11HouseRef To Com On Elections and Ethics Law
2017-04-11HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-06HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=H659&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H659v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H659v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H659v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H659v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H659v4.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=448
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=449
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=450
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=623
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1135

Bill Comments

feedback