NC H659 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Ch. SL 2015-32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Ch. SL 2015-32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Controlled Substances/Update Precursor List
Title
Controlled Substances/Update Precursor List
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - A1 Horn Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - A1 Horn Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Ch. SL 2015-32 | |
2015-05-21 | Signed by Gov. 5/21/2015 | |
2015-05-20 | Pres. To Gov. 5/20/2015 | |
2015-05-19 | Ratified | |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-29 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-28 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-04-23 | House | Postponed To 04/28/2015 |
2015-04-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/23/2015 |
2015-04-22 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-04-22 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-14 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary III |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-13 | House | Filed |