NC H654 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Car Dealer Displays Must Contain Contact Info

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Car Dealer Displays Must Contain Contact Info

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-29SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-29SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-26HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-25HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-04-25HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-25HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-25HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-10HouseRef to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-10HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-09HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback