NC H645 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6)
Status: Vetoed on August 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-22 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revisions to Outdoor Advertising Laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revisions to Outdoor Advertising Laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-07 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 60 N: 54 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-07-23 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 19 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-07-23 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 19 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-07-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-22 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-07-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - A1 McGrady Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - A2 John Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - A3 Jackson Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - A4 Saine Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - A6 Smith, R. Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 73 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-22HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-08-22HouseReceived from the Governor
2019-08-22 Vetoed 08/22/2019
2019-08-12 Pres. To Gov. 8/12/2019
2019-08-09 Ratified
2019-08-07HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-08-07HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-08-05HousePlaced On Cal For 08/07/2019
2019-08-05HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-30HousePlaced On Cal For 08/06/2019
2019-07-30HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-29HousePlaced On Cal For 07/30/2019
2019-07-24HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-07-24HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-07-24SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-07-23SenateEngrossed
2019-07-23SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-23SenateAmend Failed A3
2019-07-23SenateAmend Failed A2
2019-07-22SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-22SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-07-16SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/22/2019
2019-07-16SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-15SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/16/2019
2019-07-15SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-10SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/15/2019
2019-07-10SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-09SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/10/2019
2019-07-09SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-08SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/09/2019
2019-07-08SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-02SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-07-02SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-01SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/02/2019
2019-07-01SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-28SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-27SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-27SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-26SenateRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2019-06-26SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-26SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-20SenateRe-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-07SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-07SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-07SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-05-07HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-07HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-05-07HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-07HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-07HouseAmend Adopted A6
2019-05-07HouseAmendment Withdrawn A5
2019-05-07HouseAmend Adopted A4
2019-05-07HouseAmend Adopted A3
2019-05-07HouseAmend Adopted A2
2019-05-07HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-05-06HousePlaced On Cal For 05/07/2019
2019-05-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-06HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-05-01HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-01HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-30HouseRe-ref Com On State and Local Government
2019-04-30HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-10HouseRef to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-10HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S534 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H645
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H645v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H645v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H645v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H645v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H645v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H645v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H645v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H645v7.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/439
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/438
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/437
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/436
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/435
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/434
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/506
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/505
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/525
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/524
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/523
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/734

Bill Comments

feedback