NC H644 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Remote Academies
Title
Remote Academies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 95 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/05/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-26 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-21 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Distance Education
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Internet
Kindergarten
Local Government
Public
Secondary Education
State Board Of
Telecommunications
Teleservices
Distance Education
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Internet
Kindergarten
Local Government
Public
Secondary Education
State Board Of
Telecommunications
Teleservices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
115C | 234 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 234.10 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 234.15 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 234.20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 234.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
150B | 21.1A | (n/a) | Citation Text |