NC H644 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Charter School Transportation Grant Program
Title
Charter School Transportation Grant Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2017-05-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Transportation |
2017-05-11 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-10 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Transportation |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-06 | House | Filed |