NC H642 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-14)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Ch. SL 2021-64
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Down Syndrome Organ Trans. Nondiscrim. Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Down Syndrome Organ Trans. Nondiscrim. Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-22 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01 Ch. SL 2021-64
2021-07-01 Signed by Gov. 7/1/2021
2021-06-24 Pres. To Gov. 6/24/2021
2021-06-23 Ratified
2021-06-22HouseOrdered Enrolled
2021-06-22HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2021-06-21HousePlaced On Cal For 06/22/2021
2021-06-21HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2021-06-17HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2021-06-17SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-06-15SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-06-15SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-06-14SenateReptd Fav
2021-06-09SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-09SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-06-09SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-06-02SenateRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2021-06-02SenateReptd Fav
2021-06-01SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-01SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-27SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-27SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-12SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-12SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-12SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-05-12HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-11HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-11HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-11HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-05-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-11HouseReptd Fav
2021-05-11HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-11HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-04-26HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-26HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-21HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H642
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H642v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H642v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H642v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H642v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H642v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H642v5.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51595/0/H642-PCS30413-BP-13
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52058/0/H642-PCS40634-TU-14
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H642-SMBP-37(e1)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H642-SMBP-46(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H642-SMBP-54(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H642-SMTU-52(e2)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H642-SMTU-53(e3)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/298
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/277
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/405

Bill Comments 750

feedback