NC H64 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-09 - Conf Com Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-09 - Conf Com Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Government Transparency Act of 2021
Title
Government Transparency Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-09 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2021-08-04 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2021-06-16 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2021-06-16 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-06-16 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2021-06-15 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-04-15 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-14 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-04-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-02-16 | House | Re-ref Com On State Government |
2021-02-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-02-10 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Appointments
Authorities
Boards
Colleges & Universities
Commissions
Confidentiality
Council Of State
Counties
Dhhs
Disabled Persons
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Employment
Government Employees
Governor
Health Services
Higher Education
Hospitals
Human Resources Office
Kindergarten
Local Government
Local Government Employees
Medical Records
Membership
Municipalities
Ncworks Comn.
Occupations
Personnel
Privacy
Public
Public Health
Public Health Authority
Public Officials
Records
School Staff
Secondary Education
State Employees
Teachers
Title Change
Unc
Unc Boards Of Trustees
Authorities
Boards
Colleges & Universities
Commissions
Confidentiality
Council Of State
Counties
Dhhs
Disabled Persons
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Employment
Government Employees
Governor
Health Services
Higher Education
Hospitals
Human Resources Office
Kindergarten
Local Government
Local Government Employees
Medical Records
Membership
Municipalities
Ncworks Comn.
Occupations
Personnel
Privacy
Public
Public Health
Public Health Authority
Public Officials
Records
School Staff
Secondary Education
State Employees
Teachers
Title Change
Unc
Unc Boards Of Trustees
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | 320 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115D | 28 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
122C | 158 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
126 | 22 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
126 | 23 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 45.9 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
131E | 257.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
153A | 98 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
153A | 99 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 168 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
162A | 6.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |