NC H621 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-5)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expungement Process Modifications
Title
Expungement Process Modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-04-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-04-26 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2017-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-10 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-06 | House | Filed |