NC H616 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Ch. SL 2009-37
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Ch. SL 2009-37
Summary
Offense for Portable Toilets/Pumper Trucks.
Title
Offense for Portable Toilets/Pumper Trucks.
Sponsors
Rep. Lucy Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-27 | Ch. SL 2009-37 | |
2009-05-27 | Signed By Gov. 5/27/2009 | |
2009-05-26 | Pres. To Gov. 5/22/2009 | |
2009-05-21 | Ratified | |
2009-05-20 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-19 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-30 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-04-30 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-27 | Postponed To 4/28/2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed On Cal For 4/27/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-22 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-03-25 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-03-25 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-17 | Ref to the Com on Environment and Natural Resources, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-03-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S714 (Same As) 2011-04-20 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H616 |