NC H612 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
DSS Review of Procedures/Criminal History/OAH
Title
DSS Review of Procedures/Criminal History/OAH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 60 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 26 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 26 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-07-07 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2020-07-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/08/2020 |
2020-07-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 44.2 |
2020-07-02 | House | Received from the Governor |
2020-07-02 | Vetoed 07/02/2020 | |
2020-06-26 | Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2020 | |
2020-06-26 | Ratified | |
2020-06-26 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Conf Report #2 Adopted |
2020-06-25 | House | Conf Report #2 Adopted |
2020-06-25 | House | Added to Calendar |
2020-06-25 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Conf Com #2 Reported |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Conf Rpt Recon/withdrawn |
2020-06-25 | House | Conf Rpt Withdrawn |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2020-06-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/25/2020 |
2020-06-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d) |
2020-06-24 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2020-06-22 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2020-06-18 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2020-06-18 | House | Added to Calendar |
2020-06-18 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-06-17 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-17 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/17/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-06-16 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-06-11 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-11 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Added |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Judiciary Added |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Stricken |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-05-03 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/02/2019 |
2019-05-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-08 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-04 | House | Filed |