NC H608 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-24)
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Ch. SL 2021-143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Dignity for Women Who are Incarcerated

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dignity for Women Who are Incarcerated

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-31 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-08-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-10 Ch. SL 2021-143
2021-09-10 Signed by Gov. 9/10/2021
2021-09-01 Pres. To Gov. 9/1/2021
2021-09-01 Ratified
2021-08-31HouseOrdered Enrolled
2021-08-31HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2021-08-30HousePlaced On Cal For 08/31/2021
2021-08-30HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2021-08-26HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2021-08-26SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-08-25SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-08-25SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-08-24SenateReptd Fav
2021-08-18SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-08-18SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-08-18SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-08-10SenateRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2021-08-10SenateReptd Fav
2021-08-05SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-08-05SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-11SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-11SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-11SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-05-11HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-10HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-10HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-06HousePlaced On Cal For 05/10/2021
2021-05-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-06HouseReptd Fav
2021-05-06HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-06HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-04-21HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-21HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-20HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H608
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H608v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H608v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H608v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H608v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H608v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H608v5.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51470/0/H608-PCS40572-SH-30
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52787/0/H608-PCS30463-CE-26
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H608-SMSH-60(e1)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H608-SMSH-63(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H608-SMSH-97(e2)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H608-SMCE-92(e2)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H608-SMCE-93(CSCE-26)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H608-SMCE-98(e3)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/253
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/417
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/502

Bill Comments 750

feedback