NC H608 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-07 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-07 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Summary
Scrapped Vehicle Records.
Title
Scrapped Vehicle Records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-07 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-05-07 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-05-06 | Placed On Cal For 5/7/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-06 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-30 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-04-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-16 | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S545 (Same As) 2011-04-12 - Ref To Com On Finance
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H608 |