NC H606 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit Collusive Settlements by the AG
Title
Prohibit Collusive Settlements by the AG
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 62 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Third Reading M4 Previous Question (Y: 60 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Third Reading M4 Previous Question (Y: 60 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-07 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/06/2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-21 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Attorney General
Civil Actions
Constitution
Council Of State
Courts
General Assembly
Justice Dept.
Nc
President Pro Tempore
Public
Public Officials
Separation Of Powers
Speaker
Civil Actions
Constitution
Council Of State
Courts
General Assembly
Justice Dept.
Nc
President Pro Tempore
Public
Public Officials
Separation Of Powers
Speaker
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
114 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
114 | 2.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
114 | 2.4 | (n/a) | Citation Text |