NC H604 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Optional Courtesy Safety Call/Child Care
Title
Optional Courtesy Safety Call/Child Care
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Davis [R] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Carolyn Logan [D] | Rep. Ben Moss [R] |
Rep. Larry Pittman [R] | Rep. Shelly Willingham [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-20 | House | Ref to the Com on Families, Children, and Aging Policy, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Day Care
Infrastructure
Liability
Minors
Public
Public Health
Safety
Social Services
Telecommunications
Telephones
Title Change
Infrastructure
Liability
Minors
Public
Public Health
Safety
Social Services
Telecommunications
Telephones
Title Change
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
110 | 102.1B | (n/a) | Citation Text |