NC H602 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Cities/Require Performance Guarantees
Title
Cities/Require Performance Guarantees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-25 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/25/2017 |
2017-04-24 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-04-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-20 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-20 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-06 | House | Ref To Com On State and Local Government II |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Filed |