NC H6 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-02-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Ed. Finance Reform Task Force/PED Report

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ed. Finance Reform Task Force/PED Report

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-23 - House - Third Reading (Y: 106 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - A2 Insko Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - House - A1 Graham, C. Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 65 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-27SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-02-27SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-02-27SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-02-23HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-02-23HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-02-23HouseAmend Failed A2
2017-02-23HouseAmend Failed A1
2017-02-22HousePlaced On Cal For 02/23/2017
2017-02-22HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2017-02-22HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-02-21HousePlaced On Cal For 02/22/2017
2017-02-21HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-02-21HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-01-26HouseRef To Com On Education - K-12
2017-01-26HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-01-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S9 (Same As) 2017-01-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=H6&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H6v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H6v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H6v2.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=20
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=28
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=29
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=30

Bill Comments

feedback