NC H597 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on August 19 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Pres. To Gov. 8/20/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Wildlife Resources Commission Amends

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wildlife Resources Commission Amends

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-19 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 108 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-08-07 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-08-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-08-07 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-08-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - House - A1 Pittman Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-20 Pres. To Gov. 8/20/2019
2019-08-20 Ratified
2019-08-19HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-08-19HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-08-15HousePlaced On Cal For 08/19/2019
2019-08-13HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-08-13HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-12HousePlaced On Cal For 08/14/2019
2019-08-12HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-08-09HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-08-09SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-08-07SenateEngrossed
2019-08-07SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-07SenateAmend Adopted A3
2019-08-07SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-07SenateAmend Adopted A2
2019-08-07SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-08-06SenateReptd Fav
2019-07-24SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-07-24SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-07-24SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-07-23SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-07-23SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-07-23SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-07-22SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-07-22SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-07-18SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-07-18SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-07-11SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-07-11SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-07-11SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-07-11HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-07-10HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-07-10HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-10HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-10HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-07-01HousePlaced On Cal For 07/10/2019
2019-07-01HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-28HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-28HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-05-15HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-15HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-16HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-04-16HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-08HouseRef to the Com on Wildlife Resources, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-08HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-03HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H597
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H597v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H597v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H597v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H597v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H597v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H597v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H597v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H597v7.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H597v8.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/637
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/636
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/546
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/545
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/537
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/536
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/535
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/757

Bill Comments

feedback