NC H594 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Failed To Override Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Temp Open Gyms/Health Clubs/Fitness Ctrs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Temp Open Gyms/Health Clubs/Fitness Ctrs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - House - Veto Override (Y: 66 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 69 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-24HouseFailed To Override Veto
2020-06-22HousePlaced On Cal For 06/24/2020
2020-06-22HouseWithdrawn From Com
2020-06-19HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2020-06-19HouseReceived from the Governor
2020-06-19 Vetoed 06/19/2020
2020-06-10 Pres. To Gov. 6/10/2020
2020-06-10 Ratified
2020-06-10HouseOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-10HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2020-06-09HousePlaced On Cal For 06/10/2020
2020-06-09HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2020-06-09HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2020-06-09SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2020-06-09SenateEngrossed
2020-06-09SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-09SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-09SenateAmend Adopted A1
2020-06-08SenateReptd Fav
2020-06-04SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-04SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2020-06-04SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-06-03SenateSequential Referral To Judiciary Stricken
2020-05-27SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-05-27SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-05-06HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-06HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-06HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-06HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-05-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-06HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-03HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-03HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-08HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-08HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-03HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H594
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H594v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H594v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H594v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H594v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H594v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H594v5.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/399
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/715
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/714
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/951
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1030

Bill Comments

feedback