NC H580 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations, Health and Human Services
Pending: House Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations, Health and Human Services
Pending: House Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Increase Foster Care Rates/Funds
Title
Increase Foster Care Rates/Funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations, Health and Human Services |
2019-04-30 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-04 | House | Ref to the Com on Homelessness, Foster Care, and Dependency, if favorable, Appropriations, Health and Human Services, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S636 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H580 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H580v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H580v1.pdf |