NC H577 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-05 - Conferees Changed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-05 - Conferees Changed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
LSC Crim. Check/Felonious Gaming Machines
Title
LSC Crim. Check/Felonious Gaming Machines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | House | Conferees Changed |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2018-06-04 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2018-06-04 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2018-06-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/04/2018 |
2018-06-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-01 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III |
2017-06-29 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-28 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub and S Amend |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-27 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/26/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-06 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Filed |