NC H576 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-28 - Placed On Cal For 08/30/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Allow Aerosolization of Leachate

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow Aerosolization of Leachate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 15 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Amendment 1 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 75 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - A1 McGrady Second Reading (Y: 55 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-28HousePlaced On Cal For 08/30/2017
2017-08-28HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2017-08-24HousePlaced On Cal For 08/28/2017
2017-08-24HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2017-08-22HousePlaced On Cal For 08/24/2017
2017-08-22HouseWithdrawn From Com
2017-08-03HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2017-06-30 Vetoed 06/30/2017
2017-06-20 Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2017
2017-06-19 Ratified
2017-06-15SenateOrdered Enrolled
2017-06-15SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-15SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-15SenateAmend Failed A2
2017-06-15SenateAmend Tabled A1
2017-06-14SenateReptd Fav
2017-05-31SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-05-31SenateReptd Fav
2017-05-17SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-05-17SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-04-26SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-26SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-26SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-04-26HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-04-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-04-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-04-25HouseAmend Failed A1
2017-04-24HousePlaced On Cal For 04/25/2017
2017-04-24HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-04-24HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2017-04-21HouseRef To Com On Environment
2017-04-21HouseWithdrawn From Com
2017-04-20HouseRe-ref Com On Agriculture
2017-04-20HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-04-19HouseSerial Referral To Agriculture Added
2017-04-06HouseRef To Com On Environment
2017-04-06HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-05HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=H576&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H576v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H576v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H576v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H576v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H576v4.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=326
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=327
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=272
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=273
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=274

Bill Comments

feedback