NC H572 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
No Vaccine Mandate by EO, Rule, or Agency
Title
No Vaccine Mandate by EO, Rule, or Agency
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Kidwell [R] | Sen. Bobby Hanig [R] | Rep. Ben Moss [R] | Rep. Mike Clampitt [R] |
Rep. Edward Goodwin [R] | Rep. Jeffrey McNeely [R] | Rep. Larry Pittman [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 75 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/10/2021 |
2021-05-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-19 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Admin. Hearings Office
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Dhhs
Disasters & Emergencies
Diseases & Health Disorders
Emergency Equipment
Emergency Management
Emergency Services
Executive Orders
Governor
Health Depts.
Health Services
Local Government
Medical Equipment
Public
Public Health
Public Health Emergency
Safety
Safety Equipment
State Employees
State Health Director
Title Change
Vaccines
Work Safety
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Dhhs
Disasters & Emergencies
Diseases & Health Disorders
Emergency Equipment
Emergency Management
Emergency Services
Executive Orders
Governor
Health Depts.
Health Services
Local Government
Medical Equipment
Public
Public Health
Public Health Emergency
Safety
Safety Equipment
State Employees
State Health Director
Title Change
Vaccines
Work Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
150B | 19 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
166A | 19.12 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
166A | 19.30 | (n/a) | Citation Text |