NC H564 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Second Amendment Financial Privacy Act
Title
Second Amendment Financial Privacy Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary 1 |
2023-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-04-05 | House | Ref to the Com on Banking, if favorable, Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Commerce
Confidentiality
Constitution
Consumer Credit
Consumer Protection
Courts
Financial Services
Liability
Nc
Privacy
Public
Retailing
Us
Weapons
Commerce
Confidentiality
Constitution
Consumer Credit
Consumer Protection
Courts
Financial Services
Liability
Nc
Privacy
Public
Retailing
Us
Weapons
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
66 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
66 | 501 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
66 | 502 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
66 | 503 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
66 | 504 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
66 | 505 | (n/a) | Citation Text |