NC H562 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Ch. SL 2013-178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Ch. SL 2013-178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cramerton Charter Revisal
Title
Cramerton Charter Revisal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-19 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 27 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 27 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Ch. SL 2013-178 | |
2013-06-20 | Ratified | |
2013-06-19 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-19 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2013-06-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/19/2013 |
2013-06-18 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2013-06-17 | House | Rec To Concur S Com Sub |
2013-06-17 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-13 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/13/2013 |
2013-05-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-09 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-04 | House | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-03 | House | Filed |