NC H560 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Public Safety Reform

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety Reform

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - House - A2 John Second Reading (Y: 52 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-05 - House - A2 John Second Reading M4 Previous Question (Y: 66 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 89 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-05-06HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-05HouseOrdered Engrossed
2021-05-05HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-05HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-05HouseAmend Adopted A4
2021-05-05HouseAmend Adopted A3
2021-05-05HouseAmend Failed A2
2021-05-05HouseAmend Adopted A1
2021-05-04HousePlaced On Cal For 05/05/2021
2021-05-04HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-04HouseReptd Fav
2021-05-04HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-04HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-04-15HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-15HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H560
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H560v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H560v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H560v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H560v3.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51184/0/H560-PCS40534-SA-23
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51387/0/H560-ASA-17-V-1
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51379/0/H560-ASA-14-V-1
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51384/0/H560-ASA-16-V-1
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51382/0/H560-ASA-15-V-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H560-SMSA-35(CSSA-23)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H560-SMSA-44(e2)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/194
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/192
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/193

Bill Comments 750

feedback