NC H554 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Ch. SL 2021-109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Designate 2023 as Year of the Trail

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate 2023 as Year of the Trail

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-16 Ch. SL 2021-109
2021-08-16 Signed by Gov. 8/16/2021
2021-08-12 Pres. To Gov. 8/12/2021
2021-08-11 Ratified
2021-08-10SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-08-10SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-08-10SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-08-09SenateReptd Fav
2021-06-30SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-30SenateReptd Fav
2021-06-17SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-17SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-05-06HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-05HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-05HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-04HousePlaced On Cal For 05/05/2021
2021-05-04HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-04HouseReptd Fav
2021-04-28HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-28HouseReptd Fav
2021-04-15HouseRef to the Com on State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-15HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-13HouseFiled

Subjects


North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback